Jenkins v. Appeal Coordinator R J Donovan Facility et al
Plaintiff: |
Christopher Lee Jenkins |
Defendant: |
R J Donovan, Reid, A R Peterson, Ruddy, J McNeil, C Russell and Taylor |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00116 |
Filed: |
January 15, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
M. James Lorenz |
Presiding Judge: |
Barbara Lynn Major |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 10, 2010 |
Filing
41
ORDER Denying 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend First Amended Complaint and Directing Clerk of Court to Close the File: Pursuant to the Courts May 19, 2010 and July 8, 2010 Orders, the entire action is DISMISSED, without prejudice, for faili ng to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and § 1915A(b) and for failing to comply with the Courts Orders. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/10/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing
34
ORDER Granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint: Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint must be received by the Court no later than Monday, August 2, 2010. If Plaintiff does not to file a Second Amended Complaint by August 2, 2010, the Court shall enter a final Order of Dismissal without prejudice for failing to state a claim. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/19/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)(jrl).
|
May 28, 2009 |
Filing
13
Order by Judge M. James Lorenz Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dsimissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim: Director of CA Department of Corrections to collect initial partial filing fee of $0 and forward to Clerk of Court , and directing payment of $350.00 balance of the filing fee collected in payments from plaintiff's prison trust account in an amount equal to 20 percent of preceding month's income credited to prisoner's trust account and forward payments to Clerk of Court each time account exceeds $10 pursuant to 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Clerk of Court to serve copy of this order on Director of CA Department of Corrections. ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED without p rejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(b) and 1915A(b). Plaintiff is GRANTED forty five (45) days leave from the date this Order is Filed in which to file a First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of a Court approved § 1983 form complaint to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/28/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Order mailed to Dept. of Corrections. Order and 1983 form mailed to Plaintiff).(mjj)
|
January 15, 2009 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/14/09 ORDERING that case is TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of California. CASE CLOSED(Dillon, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/21/2009.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?