Wachowski v. Clorox Company

Plaintiff: Peter C. Wachowski
Defendant: Clorox Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00138
Filed: January 23, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Clorox Company answer due 6/1/2009. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/15/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jpp) (jrl).
February 24, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time to respond to complaint until after plaintiff files amended complaint 23 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/24/09 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
January 22, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 22, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/23/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wachowski v. Clorox Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter C. Wachowski
Represented By: Ingrid M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clorox Company
Represented By: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?