Fidelity National Financial, Inc. et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA et al

Plaintiff: Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Chicago Title Insurance Company and Chicago Title Company
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA, Ace American Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00140
Filed: January 23, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 324 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Denying 325 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Within 21 days parties shall meet and confer and contact the magistrate judge's chambers to schedule a Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/30/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
April 9, 2014 423 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Sanctions (Doc. 398 ) The Court overrules in part and sustains in part Plaintiffs' objections to the Magistrate Judge's September 25, 2012 Order. The Court instructs the Clerk to remove the image of Docket Number 395 from the CM/ECF System, and to file that document under seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/8/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
March 28, 2014 420 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE Daubert Motions: Denying 319 FNF's motion to exclude Christopher Money's expert opinion and testimony; Denying 320 NU's motion to exclude Peter Haley's expert testimony ; Denying 321 NU'smotion to exclude Paul Amoruso's expert testimony; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 326 FNF's motion to exclude Dean Felton's expert opinion and testimony. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/28/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
May 21, 2013 411 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Pending Motions [Doc. Nos. 319 , 320 , 321 , 324 , 325 , 326 . The Court Grants 384 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File an opposition to Defendant's request for judicial notice; The Court Denies 403 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Counsel shall promptly provide a courtesy copy of the unredacted brief to chambers. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/21/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
September 25, 2012 395 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 318 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/25/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (Main Document 395 replaced on 9/25/2012, per chambers, NEF regenerated) (cge).
May 12, 2011 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Modifying 2-15-11 Scheduling Order Following 05-11-11 Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 05/12/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
May 5, 2011 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for a CMC concerning Brandt fees only 208 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 05/05/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
February 1, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 161 Defendant's Motion to Compel further Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/1/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
January 4, 2011 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 154 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/4/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
August 3, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Lifting Stay and (2) Scheduling Case Management Conference. (Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2010 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo.) On or before August 10, 2010, the parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule for any remaining fact and expert discovery, as well as proposed pretrial and trial dates. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/3/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
December 11, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 140 Joint Motion to Vacate Pre-Trial and Trial dates pending lifting of Stay. All pending pre-trial and trial deadlines and/or dates scheduled in this case are hereby vacated until the Stay (which has been imposed until the Underlying Acti on is tried to verdict or all of the claims consolidated therein are otherwise settled or disposed of) is ordered lifted, except that Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Federal Insurance Company Without Prejudice 129 is not stayed. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/11/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity National Financial, Inc. et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity National Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Karen L Vander Meer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen L Vander Meer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Title Company
Represented By: Karen L Vander Meer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA
Represented By: Kenneth D Watnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Koehler Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary J Valeriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary J Valeriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary J Valeriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?