Harvey v. Hedgpeth et al

Petitioner: Quillie L Harvey, Jr.
Respondent: A. Hedgpeth and Edmund G Brown, Jr
Case Number: 3:2009cv00150
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Request for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/3/2009. (Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (akr)
August 17, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Objections to 11 Report and Recommendation; and ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: The Report and Recommendation is adopted. The Petition is denied. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/16/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (av1).
April 29, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending that Respondent's 3 Motion to Dismiss be granted and Petitioner's 3 Motion for Equitable Tolling be denied: No later than May 20, 2009, any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Any reply to the objections shall be filed no later than June 10, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/29/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (jrl).
February 23, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Petitioner's 7 Motion for Assignment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/23/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Hedgpeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Quillie L Harvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. Hedgpeth
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?