Keshishzadeh v. Arthur J. Gallagher Service Co.

Plaintiff: Scarlet Keshishzadeh
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher Service Co.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00168
Filed: January 28, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Confirming Certification of Class Action, Granting Final Approval to Class Action Settlement, and Entering Final Judgment. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees except as provided by the Settlement. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/4/11. (kaj)
November 2, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Conditional Certification of Settlement Class and Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Approving Class Notice and Related Materials, Appointing Settlement Administrator, and Scheduling Final Approval Hearing 113 ; Final Hearing set for 3/28/2011 11:45 AM in Courtroom 09 before Judge Larry Alan Burns; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/29/10. (kaj)
May 12, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' 99 Motion to Stay: Defendants are granted 60 days from the date this order is entered to file a summary judgment motion. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/12/10. (pdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keshishzadeh v. Arthur J. Gallagher Service Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarlet Keshishzadeh
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher Service Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?