Rosales et al v. The Mortgage Store Financial , Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Carlos M. Rosales and Gloria S. Rosales
Defendant: The Mortgage Store Financial , Inc., Indymac Financial Services, Countrywide Home Loans, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and DOES 1-100
Case Number: 3:2009cv00235
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' 35 MOTION to Dismiss. Court orders Plaintiffs' to respond to 35 MOTION to Dismiss by 10/13/2009. Court vacates the hearing set for 9/28/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/23/2009. (jah) (jrl).
March 25, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Dft Indymac Financial Services' 7 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot Dft Countrywide Home Loans' 8 Motion to Dismiss. Court vacates the 4/7/2009 hearing on these motions. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/25/2009. (jah) (jrl).
March 17, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 10] Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Court construes Plaintiffs' request to enlarge time to file a first amended complaint as a Motion for Leave to Amend. Court grants plaintiffs leave to fi le an Amended Complaint by 3/23/2009. Hearing scheduled for 3/23/2009 on Defendants' 7 MOTION to Dismiss, 8 MOTION to Dismiss is continued to 4/7/2009 10:30am in Courtroom 1 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/17/2009. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales et al v. The Mortgage Store Financial , Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos M. Rosales
Represented By: David A St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria S. Rosales
Represented By: David A St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mortgage Store Financial , Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Chaise Richard Bivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?