Unique Functional Products, Inc. v. JCA Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Unique Functional Products, Inc.
Defendant: JCA Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00265
Filed: February 12, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Unique Functional Products, Inc.'s 111 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/23/2012. (knb)
February 3, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Unique Functional Products, Inc.'s 101 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or, in the alternative, 101 Motion for Summary Adjudication. Pla's motion is granted as to Pla's 5th and 17th counterclaims. The motion is denied as to the 12th counterclaim. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/3/2012. (jah)
August 3, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants Hun Choe, Chun Choe and JCA Corporation's 87 Motion to Dismiss. Court dismisses Pla's 7th cause of action for fraud and its request for punitive damages. Court is compelled to deny leave to amend as to both the f raud cause of action and all requests for punitive damages. Given that the pretrial and trial dates have already been vacated once in this matter, every effort should be made to move this case forward expeditiously. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/3/2011. (jah)
May 10, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/10/2010. (tkl)
August 24, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 joint Motion to Continue Case Management Conference Date. Case Management Conference continued to11/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/24/09. (tkl) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unique Functional Products, Inc. v. JCA Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unique Functional Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCA Corporation
Represented By: Terry S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?