Keeler v. Clay et al

Petitioner: Gerald Dean Keeler
Respondent: Ivan Clay, Sierra Conservation Center and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 3:2009cv00268
Filed: February 6, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 50 ) "Ex Parte Application for Indication by Court of Intent Re: Petitioner's Motion to Present New Evidence" is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/23/2011. (mdc)
March 23, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Petitioner's request for Expedited Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 3/23/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
February 26, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sua Sponte Substituting Respondent: The Court sua sponte orders the substitution of Matthew Cate, Secretary of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, as Respondent in place of Ivan Clay. The Clerk of the Court shall modify the docket to reflect "Matthew Cate, Secretary" as respondent in place of "Ivan Clay." Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 2/26/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).
February 6, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/5/09 ORDERING that this matter is TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)[Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keeler v. Clay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Dean Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ivan Clay
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sierra Conservation Center
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?