Horton et al v. California Credit Corp. Retirement Plan et al

Plaintiff: Michael Horton and Cathie L. Horton
Defendant: California Credit Corp. Retirement Plan, Foreclosure Specialists, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00274
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 78 Motion for Reconsideration re 77 Order and 74 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion for Summary Adjudication. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/11/2012. (jah). Modified on 1/12/2012 - Corrected spelling (jah).
December 7, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 66 Motion for Summary Adjudication; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. With respect to the rescission and the quiet title action, Court conditions both on Pla's deposit of the funds in an escrow acct. Dft ordered to provide Court with an accounting of the outstanding balance on the loan w/in 5 days of this Order. Plaintiffs may file any objections to the acocunting w/in 5 days of that. Court will issue an order regarding the amount to be tendered. Once amount is determined, Plaintiffs shall be entitled to a rescission of their loan and to quite title to the Property vis-a-vis Dft California Credit Corp. Retirement Pla prov ided they deposit the necessary tender amount in an escrow acct. Court concludes that Plaintiffs are entitled to summary judgment on their 4th cause of action alleging violations of the California unfair competition law, Court finds that Plaintiffs are not entitled to any damages on this cause of action. The parties' motions for summary judgment are denied in all othjer respects. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/7/2011. (jah)
August 13, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 20 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint; denying Defendant's 21 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiffs' TILA damages claim is dismissed w/ prejudice to extent it is premised on in sufficient disclosures at the consummation of the loan. Plaintiffs' TILA recoupment, RFDCPA, quiet title, accounting and declaratory relief claims are dismissed w/o prejudice. Plaintiffs may file a First Amended Complaint by 9/4/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/13/2009. (jah) (av1).
March 16, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Preliminary Injunction re 4 Order on Motion for TRO. During pendency of this action, Dfts are restrained and enjoined from engaging in or performing any act to deprive Plaintiffs of ownership and/or possession of the real property located at 10272 Rancho Carmel Drive, San Diego, CA 92128. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/16/2009. (jah) (jrl).
February 25, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting 3 Motion for TRO. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/11/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 01 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. This OSC and supporting papers must be served upon Dfts by 2/27/2009. Any response or opposition to this OSC must be filed by 3/6/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/25/2009. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton et al v. California Credit Corp. Retirement Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Horton
Represented By: Deborah L Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathie L. Horton
Represented By: Deborah L Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Credit Corp. Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foreclosure Specialists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?