Villalobos v. Hernandez

Petitioner: Angel Villalobos
Respondent: Robert Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2009cv00363
Filed: April 10, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting re 62 Report and Recommendation and Denying Petitioner's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/23/2012. (sjt)
October 11, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 59 Petitioners ex parte application for appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/3/2011. (mtb)
August 5, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 50 Report and Recommendation; and Denying 31 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated herein, Petitioner's Objections are overruled. The Report and Recommendation Denying Respondent's Motion to Dismiss is Adopted. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/4/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
April 15, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Reopening Case and Setting Briefing Schedule - Motion to Dismiss due 5/28/2009, Opposition to Motion due 6/28/2009 OR Answer by Respondent due 6/12/2009, Traverse by Petitioner due 7/13/2009. The Clerk of this Court shall promptly (a) serve a c opy of the Petition and a copy of this Order on the Attorney General for the State of California, or his authorized agent; and (b) serve a copy of this Order on Petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/15/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Petition and Order mailed to California Attny General. Order mailed to Petitioner).(mjj) (jrl).
March 4, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice: Because this Court cannot proceed until Petitioner has either paid the $5.00 filing fee or qualified to proceed in forma pauperis, the Court DISMISSES the case without prejudice. If Petitioner wishes to p roceed with this case, he must submit, no later than May 4, 2009, a copy of this Order with the $5.00 fee or with adequate proof of his inability to pay the fee. The Clerk of Court shall send a blank Southern District of California In Forma Pauperis Application to Petitioner along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/4/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP form mailed to petitioner).(mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villalobos v. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angel Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?