Michell et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Frank W. Michell, Mary Christine Michell and Christopher Damitz
Defendant: United States of America and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00387
Filed: February 26, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 78 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. The settlement reached between the United States and the the Settling Defendants is found to be in good faith within the meaning of Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 877.6, and any othe r joint tortfeasor is barred from any further claims against Settling Defendants for equitable comparative contribution or comparative indemnity based on comparative negligence or comparative fault. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/6/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
August 23, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 71 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/23/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
May 31, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 62 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and 63 Motion for Leave to File Interpleader. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/31/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michell et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank W. Michell
Represented By: David S Casey, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Christine Michell
Represented By: David S Casey, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Damitz
Represented By: David S Casey, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?