Nunez v. Ramirez

Plaintiff: Eduardo Nunez
Defendant: F Ramirez
Case Number: 3:2009cv00413
Filed: April 6, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(1). Attorneys David W. Beaudreau and Kurt David Hermansen appointed for Eduardo Nunez. Counsel shall file, if possible within fourteen (14) days, a formal written Notice of Substitution of Attorney signed by both Plaintiff and his newly appointed counsel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/3/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
September 24, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 74 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation; Denying 62 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/24/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
January 24, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 51 ) Report and Recommendation is adopted in its entirety. The (Doc. 48 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Centeno, Wagner, and Caldwell and the (Doc. 39 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ramirez are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/24/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
May 27, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. If Plaintiff chooses to re-file his motion, he must do so by or before June 24, 2010 and he must attach as an exhibit a proposed First Amended Complaint that names and i dentifies all old and new defendants and that sets forth all necessary facts and information, including the necessary information already alleged in the initial Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/27/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
May 3, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Re Doc. 18 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/3/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
March 24, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 10 ) Report and Recommendation is adopted. Defendant's (Doc. 6 ) Motion to Dismiss Count 1 of the Complaint is granted. Plaintiff's free speech claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/24/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).
November 12, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION For Order Granting Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Count One Of Plaintiff's Complaint: It is recommended that the District Court grant with prejudice Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count One (Doc. 6 ). Objections to R&R due by 12/3/2009. Replies due by 12/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/12/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Ramirez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?