Rivera v. Wachovia Bank et al

Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Rivera
Defendant: Wachovia Bank, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00433
Filed: March 4, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Truth in Lending Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1640 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for award of Attorney's Fees. The court awards $19,055 in attorney's fees to Defendant. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/23/09. (tkl) (jrl).
August 5, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court hereby grants Wachovia's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, including all claims raised therein, is dismissed with prejudice.(tkl) (av1).
August 4, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/4/09. The court hereby grants Wachovia's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, including all claims raised therein, is dismissed with prejudice. (tkl) (av1).
May 18, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pla's request for leave to file a First Amended Complaint 8 ; denying 7 Dft Wachovia Martgage's Motion to Dismiss as moot; denying 9 pla's Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court instructs the Clerk of Court to file Pla's First Amended Complaint the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/18/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Wachovia Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Rivera
Represented By: Jack S Feltscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank
Represented By: Frederick J Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Frederick J Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?