Singleton v. Clark

Petitioner: Chad E Singleton
Respondent: Ken Clark
Case Number: 3:2009cv00471
Filed: March 12, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Revised ORDER Granting Application for Certificate of Appealability. The Court GRANTS Singleton's request for a certificate of appealability. The appellate court may determine whether, on the evidence that Singleton is disabled, he is entitled to have his habeas petition adjudicated on the merits. Ms. Buchanan, as appointed counsel, may continue to assist Singleton with his appeal. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/19/2010. (USCA Case No. 09-57003. Revised Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
July 12, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 , 32 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. The Court GRANTS Singleton's request for a certificate of appealability. The appellate court may determine whether, on the evidence that Gunn is disabled, he is entitled to hav e his habeas petition adjudicated on the merits. Ms. Buchanan, as appointed counsel, may continue to assist Singleton with his appeal. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/12/2010. (USCA Case No. 09-57003. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
June 1, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Petitioner's Application for Certificate of Appealability. Singleton has 30 days from the date this order is entered to file an amended Application. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/27/2010. (akr)
June 4, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Regarding Respondent's 6 Motion to Dismiss: Recommending that Respondent's Motion to Dismiss be granted and the 1 Petition be dismissed with prejudice. No later than July 6, 2009, any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Any reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than July 16, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/4/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chad E Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Clark
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?