Harris v. Martel et al

Petitioner: Micah A. Harris
Respondent: M Martel and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2009cv00503
Filed: March 13, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Amador
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 22 Motion for Appointment of Counsel on Appeal. The Court GRANTS Petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis but DENIES Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel on appeal. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/17/2010. (USCA Case No. 10-55370. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
February 25, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Based upon Court's review of the entire 14 Report and Recommendations, Court adopts in part the Report and Recommendation, enters the judgment denying and dismissing the petition, and grants a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/24/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)(mam).
November 6, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, recommending that the petition for writ of habeas corpus be Denied and Dismissed re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Micah A. Harris. Objections to the Report and Recommendation are due by 12/8/2009. Replies are due by 12/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/6/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cap) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Martel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Micah A. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M Martel
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?