Mitchell v. Martel

Petitioner: Isaac A Mitchell
Respondent: M Martel
Case Number: 3:2009cv00518
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Amador
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/7/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
December 2, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Certificate of Appealability. The Court hereby DENIES a certificate of appealability as to the claims set forth in Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/1/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (akr) (av1).
June 3, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Respondent's 11 MOTION to Dismiss petition for writ of habeas corpus be granted. Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2009 Replies due by 7/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 6/3/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(asw) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isaac A Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M Martel
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?