CROWLEY et al v. EPICEPT CORPORATION, et al

Plaintiff: KENTON L. CROWLEY and JOHN A. FLORES
Defendant: Epicept Corporation and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2009cv00641
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 188 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/14/2015. (sjt)
January 26, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion to Amend Complaint and granting 50 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/24/2012. (mtb)
September 22, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 29 Motion to Continue Discovery and All Other Dates and Deadlines: The Court DENIES the motion WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If necessary, the parties may file a renewed motion after the Mandatory Settlement Conference. Counsel must diligently proceed with discovery in preparation for the Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/22/2010. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROWLEY et al v. EPICEPT CORPORATION, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENTON L. CROWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN A. FLORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epicept Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?