Rich v. Shrader et al

Plaintiff: Foster Rich
Defendant: Ralph W. Shrader, C. G. Appleby, Samuel R. Strickland, Joseph E. Garner, Dennis O. Doughty, DeAnne M. Aguirre, Shumeet Banerji, Peter Bertone, Christian Burger, Heather L. Burns, Mark J. Gerencser, Francis J. Henry, Christopher M. Kelly, David G. Knott, Daniel C. Lewis, Joseph W. Mahaffee, John D. Mayer, Helmut Meier, Patrick F. Peck, Horacio D. Rozanski, Joe Saddi, Douglas G. Swenson, Steven B. Wheeler and Booz Allen Hamilton Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00652
Filed: April 1, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 118 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/10/13. (cge)
November 26, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 119 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Defendant is directed to prepare a public redacted version of their brief, to be filed along with their sealed brief. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal Defendants Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/26/2013. (rlu)
November 13, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendant's 113 Motion to File Previously Filed Documents Under Seal; Granting in part and Denying in part the 114 Joint Motion to Seal Documents Attached to Plaintiff's Opposition. The parties are directed to prepare a redacted version of their briefs. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/13/2013. (rlu)
July 11, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER determining discovery dispute re 98 Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/11/13. (cge)
April 29, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Determining Discovery Dispute as to 92 Motion for Discovery. The Court denies Plaintiffss request to de-designate the documents Bates-stampedBAH RICH-000089 and BAH RICH-000091 through 000101. These documents shall remain designated as confidential. The Court denies Plaintiff's request to modify the Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 4/29/13. (cge)
September 22, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: The Court dismisses the RICO, ERISA, and securities fraud claims with prejudice. Plaintiff's surviving claims are (1) count 11, a tortious interference with cont ract against Defendants Ralph Shrader and Joseph E. Garner and (2) count twelve, a breach of contract claims against Defendant Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. The Clerk shall terminate this case with prejudice as to all other Defendants. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/22/11. (lmt)
January 18, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of the Court's September 17, 2010 Order [Doc.No.36]. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/18/11. (jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich v. Shrader et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foster Rich
Represented By: David R Bence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph W. Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. G. Appleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel R. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph E. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis O. Doughty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAnne M. Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shumeet Banerji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bertone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather L. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Gerencser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Knott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph W. Mahaffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmut Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick F. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horacio D. Rozanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Saddi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas G. Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?