Boudreaux v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Thaddeus Boudreaux
Respondent: James Walker and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2009cv00662
Filed: April 1, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/13/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
May 13, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/12/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
May 11, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting re 16 Report and Recommendations and Granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/11/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Walker
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?