Saunders v. Almager et al

Petitioner: Mark McLean Saunders
Respondent: V M Almager and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2009cv00708
Filed: April 17, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting re 33 Report and Recommendation in its entirety. IT IS ORDERED the petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the issuance of a certificate of appealability is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/2/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
October 20, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 26 ) Motion For Reconsideration; Denying As Moot (Doc. 24 ) Request for Enlargement of Time to File Objections to the Report and Recommendation; and Referring Matter to the Magistrate Judge. Petitioner's motion for recons ideration is Granted. The magistrate judge shall prepare a Report taking into account the entire record in this case, including petitioner's traverse. Petitioner's request for an enlargement of time to file objections to the Report is Denied as Moot. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/20/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
April 23, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 20 Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 4/19/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Almager et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark McLean Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: V M Almager
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?