Gray v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Rufus Gray, Jr.
Respondent: Stuart Ryan, - and Edmund G Brown, Jr
Case Number: 3:2009cv00709
Filed: April 8, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Finding Notice of Appeal to Ninth Circuit Was Untimely. This Court finds that Petitioner's Notice of Appeal was untimely. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/2/2013. (USCA Case Number 12-57243. Order electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.)(akr)(jrd)
July 29, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing 72 Motion for Acceptance of Untimely Objections. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
June 28, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 70 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/27/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
September 21, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 47 Report and Recommendation and Denying Petititon. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/21/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
December 2, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 32 Report and Recommendation in its entirety and Denies Petitioner's motion for stay and abeyance. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/1/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
October 27, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order Denying Petitioner's re 20 MOTION for Stay and Abeyance. Objections to R&R due by 11/24/2010. Any reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than ten days after being served with the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/27/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rufus Gray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stuart Ryan, -
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?