Larson v. Carrasco

Petitioner: Harvey Eugene Larson
Respondent: Carrasco and The Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2009cv00745
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's 64 Motion for Extension of Time; and Denying 66 Motion for Reopen the Case. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/25/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
February 28, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion to Reopen Case. Because Petitioner fails to demonstrate entitlement to relief under Rule 60(b), the Court DENIES his motion to reopen the case. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/27/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
February 25, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting In Part (Doc. 45 ) Second Report and Recommendation, Granting (Doc. 15 ) Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, Dismissing Petition As Time Barred, And Denying Motion For Leave to Amend. The Second Report and Recommendation is Adopted In Part. Petitioner's request for leave to file any further pleadings is Denied. Respondents' motion to dismiss is Granted and the Petition is Dismissed as time-barred. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Amend is Denied. A certificate of appealability is Denied. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/25/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
January 3, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Petitioner may file objections to (Doc. 45 ) the Second Report and Recommendation 1/28/2011. Any Replies must be filed by 2/11/2011. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/3/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
December 27, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on (Doc. 15 ) Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Court recommends Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be Granted and Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 12/25/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm) (av1).
August 23, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in part 26 Report and Recommendations and Remanding in part the Matter to the Magistrate Judge for Further Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harvey Eugene Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carrasco
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?