Campion v. Old Republic Home Protection Company, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Douglas J Campion
Defendant: Old Republic Home Protection Company, Inc and Does 1 - 25, Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2009cv00748
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File the First Amended Class action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 3/23/12. (lao)
May 20, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 58 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 58 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/20/11. (rlu)
January 6, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Defendant's Motion to Strike re 30 and 48 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 1/6/11. (lao)
July 7, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Doc. 36 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend his Class Action Complaint. Defendant's Opposition to (Doc. [30}) Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, shall be filed on or before August 6, 2010. Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed by August 27, 2010. A hearing will be held on September 21, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 7/7/2010. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campion v. Old Republic Home Protection Company, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas J Campion
Represented By: Francis A Bottini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Home Protection Company, Inc
Represented By: Daniel Scott Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?