Herrera et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Juan Herrera and Maria Herrera
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2009cv00756
Filed: April 14, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Motion for Summary Judgment in favor Defendant and againstPlaintiffs; Granting 33 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/21/2010. (knh)
May 10, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff's motion to subpoena (for deposition) witness Daniel Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 5/9/2010. (tkl)
February 18, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 joint Motion for a stay of proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/18/2010. (tkl)(mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Herrera
Represented By: Gregory P Konoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Herrera
Represented By: Gregory P Konoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?