Stewart v. City of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: Michael Stewart
Defendant: City of San Diego and Pam Rowlett
Case Number: 3:2009cv00844
Filed: April 23, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 99 101 103 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment: Plaintiff's papers are construed as a motion to alter or amend the judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). Plaintiff's motion is denied. The Court will not accept for filing any additional requests for reconsideration by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/10/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
December 6, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety. The Court Denies Plaintiff leave to further amend his complaint. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/6/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
November 24, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Plaintiff's 73 Request for Disclosure of Defendant Rowlett's Personnel Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 11/24/2010. (knh)
May 26, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion for TRO, requiring Defendant Pam Rowlett to avoid contact w/ Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/22/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. City of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Represented By: Wendy Elaine Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?