Merchant v. Lopez et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Harvey Merchant
Defendant: H Lopez, P Weitzeil and R Madden
Case Number: 3:2009cv00856
Filed: April 22, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/13/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
September 8, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Plaintiff's Discovery Motions (Re Docs. 42 , 44 , 46 ): All of the motions are denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 9/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
May 12, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 22 ) Motion for Review of Honorable Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Request for Leave to Take Written Deposition of Prison Employees Under Abuse of Discretion is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/12/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
March 8, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions For Leave To Take Written Depositions Of Prison Employees (Re Docs. 18 , 19 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merchant v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Harvey Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Lopez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Weitzeil
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Madden
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?