Lowry v. Metropolitan Transit Board MTBS et al

Plaintiff: Daryl Lowry
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit Board MTBS, Security and Heritage Security, Jerrod Gressett, Torrence Joseph, A. Johnson and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00882
Filed: April 28, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2013 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting the 158 Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge and Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Denying the 144 Motion for Sanctions insofar as the motion seeks costs; Dismissing with prejudice case number 09cv00882 as to Defendant Joseph. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/5/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
April 26, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 103 the Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge and Granting the Motions to Dismiss by defendants Heritage Security Services and Jerrod Gressett. The Court Adopts the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge, Di smisses with prejudice the actions as to Defendant Heritage, and Dismisses with prejudice as to Defendant Gressett. The Court Denies the 88 Motion for sanctions insofar as the motions seek costs. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/26/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
March 12, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/12/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
March 25, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Discovery Hearing. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to immediately cease and desist all threatening behavior and foul, abusive, or assaultive language towards defense counsel. The Court further orders that all of Plaintiff's future communications with Defendants and their counsel be in written form. Plaintiff may no longer communicate with Defendants or their counsel over the telephone for any reason. The Court hereby further places Plaintiff on written notice that sanctions, including dismissal of his lawsuit, may be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/25/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
April 16, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motions to Dismiss re 41 , 43 . The Court Dismisses without prejudice this suit against MTS in its entirety. The Court also Dismisses without prejudice the constitutional claims against Heritage, but the c onstitutional claims against the individual defendants survive. Furthermore, the Court Dismisses with prejudice as to all Defendants, the false swearing claim, and Dismisses without prejudice the forgery, identity theft, defamation and government civ il conspiracy claims. If Plaintiff wishes to file a Second Amended Complaint correcting the deficiencies above, he must do so within fourteen days of the issuance of this order. This is the last amendment the Court will permit. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/16/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowry v. Metropolitan Transit Board MTBS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit Board MTBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security and Heritage Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrod Gressett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrence Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?