Moody v. Unknown

Plaintiff: Floyd Moody
Defendant: Unknown, -
Case Number: 3:2009cv00892
Filed: April 20, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Entry of Final Judgment as to Defendants Finander, Ball, and Butcher; ORDER Certifying Appeal is Not Taken in Good Faith; ORDER Denying Motion to Strike Bill of Costs 160 ; ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Provide Form for Service of Pro cess; Moody is ordered, within 15 calendar days of the date this order is issued, to return the form sent to him, completed, so that the Marshall can re-attempt service on Defendant Reddy; the U.S. Marshal is ordered to re-attempt service on Defendant Reddy no later than 45 calendar days from the date this order is issued; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/28/11 (IFP package mailed to plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
January 6, 2011 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling plaintiff's objections to report and recommendation, setting aside default against defendant Manorma Reddy, and denying plaintiff's motion for entry of default judgment 77 ; the Court adopts the report and recommendation [ 89]; Reddy's pleadings point out that she was erroneously sued as Manoram Reddy and that her first name is Manorma; the Clerk is therefore directed to correct the docket to reflect this change; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/5/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
December 1, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that plaintiff's 77 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment be denied, and defendant's 84 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default be granted; Objections to R&R due 12/20/2010; Reply to Objections due within 10 days of being served with the Objections; Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/1/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj) (jrl).
October 4, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 plaintiff's request for appointment of a medical expert witness; the Court also denies plaintiff's request for a list of experts, as the Court does not maintain such lists to aid parties in the litigation of their cases; Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/4/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
October 1, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 72 motion to serve a subpoena; Defendants Finander and Ball, as employees of CDCR, are to respond to Plaintiffs request for a subpoena on or before October 15, 2010; Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/1/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
July 15, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 64 motion to name parties by caption; Court orders the Clerk's Office to remove Unknown from the docket as a defendant in this case; granting plaintiff's 65 motion for copy of the docket and orders the Cle rk's Office to send Plaintiff a copy of an up-to-date docket print-out; denying plaintiff's 65 request for sealed envelopes; the Clerk's Office is ordered to send plaintiff a copy of document no. 28. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/15/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
June 9, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying In Part and Granting in Part Plaintiff's 43 Motion to Alter, Amend or Vacate Judgment and Granting Extension of Time to Re-Attempt U.S. Marshal Service Upon Defendant Manoram Reddy Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m): Plaintiff shall c omplete the new USM Marshal Form 285 provided to him, and shall return it to the United States Marshal, along with all the necessary materials described in the Clerk's letter accompanying his IFP package, no later than July 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/9/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service, IFP package sent )(pdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?