BAKER v. MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL PROPERTIES INC et al

Plaintiff: RICHARD JAMES BAKER
Defendant: MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL PROPERTIES INC, MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL ENTERPRISES INC, Major League Baseball Players Association, SAN DIEGO PADRES BASEBALL CLUB LP, WORLD BASEBALL CLASSIC INC and ABC INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2009cv00982
Filed: May 7, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2012 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Amend Fourth Amended Complaint to Add Defendant filed by Plaintiff (Doc. 242 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/2/2012. (mdc)
May 14, 2012 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Protective Order (Re Doc. 244 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/14/2012. (mdc)
September 8, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 98 , 112 ) are granted in part and denied in part. As to the negligence claim, Count IV of the Second Amended Complaint, the Motions to Dismiss are denied. The remaining Counts of the Second Amended Complaint are dismissed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/8/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).
April 22, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. Defendant MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL PLAYERS ASSOCIATION'S 72 Motion, is GRANTED, to the extent the motion seeks transfer of venue; the motion is DENIED in all other respects as moot. 2. All other pending motions ( 69 , 70 , 71 ) are DENIED as moot. 3. Clerk shall transfer this case to the USDC for the Southern District of California, San Diego Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on April 22, 2009. (cbj) Modified on 4/28/2009 (typo) (cbj). [Transferred from Florida Northern on 5/7/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAKER v. MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL PROPERTIES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD JAMES BAKER
Represented By: Kris Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL PROPERTIES INC
Represented By: JASON BERNARD ONACKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By: JASON BERNARD ONACKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major League Baseball Players Association
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAN DIEGO PADRES BASEBALL CLUB LP
Represented By: JASON BERNARD ONACKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD BASEBALL CLASSIC INC
Represented By: JASON BERNARD ONACKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?