Coleman v. Iovate Health Sciences U.S.A. Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cody Coleman
Defendant: Iovate Health Sciences U.S.A. Inc. and Iovate Health Sciences Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00988
Filed: May 7, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Appointment of the Personal Injury Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/11/2010.Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM -AJB et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)CC: MDL Panel(mjj) (jrl).
February 16, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER in case 3:09-cv-00988-BTM-AJB; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of record. Attorney Gregory Pius DiLeo; Jennifer B. Eagan; Madro Bandaries and Jeffrey P. Berniard terminated in case 3:09-md-02087-BTM -AJB. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/12/2010. Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM -AJB, 3:09-cv-00988-BTM-AJB(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(tkl) (jrl).
February 3, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re joint motion to continue (66) deadlines concerning defendant Kerr Investment Holding Corp's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2). The Court orders that the close of discovery in connection with t he Motion is extended to 3/19/2010. Opposition to Motion is extended to 4/21/2010; reply to Motion is extended to 5/10/2010. Motion is rescheduled for 5/17/2010 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/3/2010. Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM -AJB et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Iovate Health Sciences U.S.A. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Coleman
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iovate Health Sciences U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iovate Health Sciences Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?