Rodriguez v. Smalls et al

Petitioner: Adrian Rodriguez
Respondent: Larry Smalls and Edmund Brown, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00993
Filed: May 7, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 19 ) Report and Recommendation is adopted in its entirety. The (Doc. 12 ) Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/16/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (av1).
February 10, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION That Respondent's Motion To Dismiss Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus Be Granted (Re Doc. 12 ). Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2010. Replies to the objections due no later than seven days after being served with the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 2/10/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).
October 27, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Appointment Of Counsel (Re Doc. 17 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 10/27/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Smalls et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adrian Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Smalls
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?