Dremak v. Iovate Health Sciences Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Dremak
Defendant: Iovate Health Sciences Group, Inc., Iovate Health Sciences, Inc., Iovate Health Sciences U.S.A., Inc. and GNC Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv01088
Filed: May 19, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2014 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 334 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/18/14.(rlu)
March 3, 2014 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 294 Application for Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions and Other Relief. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/3/2014.(rlu)
January 27, 2014 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Iovate Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Ordering More Definite Statement as to Claims Against Retailer Defendants, and Denying Retailer Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Iovate Defendants' motion is Denied without prejudic e. The Retailer Defendants' motion is also Denied because the Court orders Plaintiffs to file a more definite statement as detailed above. The Iovate Defendants shall file an Answer to the SAC within 20 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/27/2014.(rlu)
November 19, 2013 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 201 Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/19/2013. (rlu)
November 12, 2013 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request for Clarification; Denying Motion to Strike Objection to the Extent that it Argues Lack of Standing due to Failure to Submit Claim Form. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/12/2013.(rlu)
October 24, 2013 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion to Strike Objections; Order Denying 259 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court Grants the Motion to Strike with Respect to Sasha McBean and Tim Blanchard because the Court has already held that they lack standing ( 242 Order Strik ing Objections). Ms. McBean's and Mr. Blanchard's Objections 243 and 244 shall be stricken. The Court Grants the Motion to Strike the Objection of Fatima Dorego and Orders her Objection 251 stricken. The Court Denies without prejudice the Motion to Strike the Objection of Michelle Rodriguez. An Order to Show Cause re: the standing of Michelle Rodriguez is scheduled for 11/13/2013 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/24/2013. (rlu)
September 17, 2013 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking Objections Due to Objectors' Lack of Standing re 09md2087-ECF #1640 Objections filed by Sasha McBean, Tim Blanchard. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/17/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Served as Directed in Order)(rlu)(jrd)
April 29, 2013 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 204 Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena. The Court Grants the motion to quash with respect to the subpoena directed to attorney Darrell Palmer. The Court orders that the Objectors appear for an evidentiary hearing on 5/29/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/29/2013. (rlu)(jrd)
August 25, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 134 Ex Parte Application to file under seal portions of the courts July 12, 2011 order. The Court shall file a redacted version of the July 12, 2011 Order on the public docket. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/24/11. (ecs)(jrd)
May 31, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 117 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to amend their complaint to remedy the deficiencies identified above. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Consolidated Complaint within 60 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/31/2011. (jer)
March 29, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 81 Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits. Within 10 days of the filing of this Order, Defendant shall electronically file all of the exhibits that are not to be sealed and the redacted versions of Exhibits 1 and 2. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/29/2011. (jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dremak v. Iovate Health Sciences Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Dremak
Represented By: Timothy Gordon Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iovate Health Sciences Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iovate Health Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iovate Health Sciences U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GNC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?