Lowry v. Metropolitan Transit et al
Plaintiff: |
Daryl Lowry |
Defendant: |
Metropolitan Transit, Heritage Security, Bobby Salas, Edwin Ambriz and DOES |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv01141 |
Filed: |
May 27, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
William McCurine |
Presiding Judge: |
Barry Ted Moskowitz |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 5, 2013 |
Filing
149
ORDER Adopting the 133 Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge and Granting the Motion to Dismiss with prejudice by Defendant Edwin Ambriz in case number 09cv1141; Denying the 120 Motion for Sanctions insofar as it seeks costs; Order to Show Cause Why Service Should not be Quashed as to Bobby Salas and Why Salas Should Not Be Dismissed. The Court further Orders that the U.S. Marshall who signed the proof of service for Bobby Salas, Mr. Scott Hilbert, appear at the hearing to descri be the method by which he served the Complaint. Plaintiff has until August 19, 2013 to respond. The OSC hearing will be on August 22, 2013 at 11:00 A.M. Plaintiff must appear. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/5/2013. (cc: Marshal) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
|
April 26, 2012 |
Filing
104
ORDER adopting 89 the Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge and Granting the Motions to Dismiss by defendants Heritage Security Services and Jerrod Gressett. The Court Adopts the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge, Dismisses with prejudice the actions as to Defendant Heritage. The Court Denies the 76 Motion for sanctions insofar as the motions seek costs. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/26/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
|
March 13, 2012 |
Filing
99
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/12/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing
64
ORDER Following Discovery Hearing. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to immediately cease and desist all threatening behavior and foul, abusive, or assaultive language towards defense counsel. The Court further orders that all of Plaintiff's future co mmunications with Defendants and their counsel be in written form. Plaintiff may no longer communicate with Defendants or their counsel over the telephone for any reason. The Court hereby further places Plaintiff on written notice that sanctions, including dismissal of his lawsuit, may be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/25/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing
41
ORDER Re Motions to Dismiss. Granting 27 motion to dismiss; Granting in part and denying in part [Docs. 29,38] motion to dismiss. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint must be filed within fourteen days of the issuance of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/14/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?