Oldham et al v. Travelers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Larry V. Oldham, Lori Oldham and Larry Oldham, III
Defendant: Travelers, Inc., DOES, The Standard Fire Insurance Company, St. Paul Travelers Insurance Company and Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, .
Case Number: 3:2009cv01225
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 27 Appointment of Guardian ad Litem. The Oldhams must retain counsel in order to pursue claims on behalf of L.V.O., III. Mr. and Mrs. Oldham shall have thirty-five days (35) from the date this Order is electronically filed to retain couns el for L.V.O. If they fail to do so, L.V.O.'s claims will be dismissed without prejudice. If Lori Oldham desires to proceed pro se she must act on her own behalf; she may not be represented by, or act through, Larry Oldham. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/6/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
January 4, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Oral Argument. Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended complaint. The motion is currently scheduled for hearing on Friday, January 8, 2010. The matter is suitable for submission without oral argument pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, no appearances are required at this time. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/4/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
December 18, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: The date and time of the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel 16 on 12/22/09 is Vacated. (Motion Hearing reset for 1/8/2010 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/18/09.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oldham et al v. Travelers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry V. Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Oldham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John T Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Travelers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, .
Represented By: John T Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?