Johnson v. Homecomings Financial et al

Plaintiff: Wes W. Johnson
Defendant: Homecomings Financial, GMAC Mortgage, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Executive Trustee Services, Pite Duncan and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01262
Filed: June 10, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Vacate. Plaintiffs refiled motion for reconsideration 59 , deemed timely filed on May 18, 2012, isReopened. Plaintiff may file on or before December 18, 2015, an amended motion for reconside ration to update legal arguments and citations. The amended motion for reconsideration will relate back to the initial May 18, 2012 filing date, and will be deemed timely filed for purposes of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59 and 60. Defendants sh all file a response to the amended motion for reconsideration on or before January 4, 2016; Plaintiff may file a reply memorandum on or before January 11, 2016. The amended motion will be considered without oral argument after January 19, 2016. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/11/2015. (sjt)
April 19, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint With Prejudice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/19/2012. (mtb)
September 20, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. The followingclaims are dismissed with prejudice: NRS 598D.100; wrongful foreclosure; quiet title; violation of FCRA, FDCPA and TILA; unjust enrichment. The following claims are dismissed without prejudice: all fraud claims; breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing; and breach of contract. Because injunctive and declaratory judgment are remedies, they are dismissed as causes of action. If plaintiff intends to file a second amended complaint, he must do so in conformity with this Order no later than October 3, 2011. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/19/2011. (mtb)
August 5, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend: If plaintiff intends to amend the complaint, he must do so within 20 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/5/2010. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Homecomings Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wes W. Johnson
Represented By: Tory M. Pankopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Trustee Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pite Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?