Doktoreztk v. Morales et al

Plaintiff: Michael Doktoreztk
Defendant: S Morales and John Doe #1
Case Number: 3:2009cv01288
Filed: June 12, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sustaining Objections to 51 Report and Recommendation Re: Denial of Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The court concludes that Defendant is entitled to summary judgment because Plaintiff fails to come forward with sufficient admissible evidence under Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(c)(4) to create a genuine issues of material fact that there was an obvious risk of harm to Plaintiff in the form of a standing order that general population inmates must assault all SNY inmates on sight. The court sustains the Objections, declines to adopt the R & R, and grants summary judgment in favor of Defendant Morales and against Plaintiff Doktoreztk. As the court concludes that no constitutional violation occurred, it need not address qualified immunity. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/30/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
April 9, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Defendant's ex parte Motion to Take Deposition of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/9/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
March 30, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER REGULATING DISCOVERY AND OTHER PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. The Defendants' Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time to Continue Discovery Cut Off Date 22 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law by August 20, 2010. The proposed final pretrial conference order by September 10, 2010. The final pretrial conference shall be held before the Honorable Jeffery T. Miller, on September 17, 2010, at 8:30 A.M. 11. The trial is set for November 1, 2010 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/30/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
February 22, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Plaintiff's Application For Enlargement of Time To Serve Specific Discovery Requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/22/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
September 2, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion and Declaration for Appointment of Counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 9/2/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doktoreztk v. Morales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Doktoreztk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Morales
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?