Munoz v. Fredrick et al

Plaintiff: Juan Munoz
Defendant: M Fredrick, Robert J Hernandez, E Contreras, R Contreras, A Legdaan and J Rodriguas
Case Number: 3:2009cv01303
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 73 Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56. Clerk shall enter judgment for the Defendants and close the file. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/13/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
April 1, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 98 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice at this time. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/1/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
March 25, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b) and 12(B)(6). Dfts R. Contreras and J. Rodriguas are dismissed from action for failing to prosecute pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Dfts Freder ick and Lagdaan shall file Answer to the 8th Amendment excessive force claims remaining in Pla's Complaint w/in 14 days of the date this Order is "Filed" pursuant to FRCP 12(a)(4)(A). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/25/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. Fredrick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Fredrick
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Contreras
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Contreras
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Legdaan
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Rodriguas
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?