Aaronson v. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Plaintiff: Zack Aaronson
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01333
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Sua Sponte Striking Certain Allegations From the First Amended Complaint, and (2) Denying (Doc. 91 ) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court sua sponte Strikes all class-action and safety allegations in the First Amended Complaint, and Denies Defendant Vital Pharm's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/12/2013. (srm)
May 12, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte 57 Application for Extension of Deadline to File Class Certification Motion. Plaintiff's motion for class certification must be filed no later than 5/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/12/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
February 17, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part (Doc. 6 ) Motion to Dismiss. The Court Grants Without Prejudice the motion to dismiss the first two causes of action and Denies the motion as to the remaining causes of action. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/17/2010. (cap) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaronson v. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zack Aaronson
Represented By: Harold M Hewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?