Grayson et al v. 7-Eleven, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Leroy Grayson and Alvin McKenzie
Defendant: 7-Eleven, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01353
Filed: June 23, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 58 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting 57 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/21/2013. (srm)
March 28, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 47 Motion for Certification of Class Action. For the reasons stated herein, the Court finds the proposed class satisfies the requirements for class certification pursuant to Rule 23(b)(3). Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/28/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
June 10, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Decertifying Class: For the reasons stated herein, the Court concludes maintaining this lawsuit as a nationwide class action is not appropriate, and orders that the Court hereby Vacates its 7/21/2010 Order (Doc. 25 ). The previously certified nationwide class is decertified without prejudice to renewal of a motion for class certification consistent with this order. (2) The parties shall submit a joint status report, by 6/24/2011, notifying theCourt whether they desire the Court to rule o n the pending summary judgment motions as to the named plaintiffs Grayson and McKenzie only, or whether the parties will withdraw their pending Rule 56 motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/10/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayson et al v. 7-Eleven, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Grayson
Represented By: James Jason Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin McKenzie
Represented By: James Jason Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?