Weakley v. Redline Recovery Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Aaron Weakley
Defendant: Redline Recovery Services, LLC, Jay Riley Chates and Ken Hardy
Case Number: 3:2009cv01423
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Sanctions. Defendant's counsel shall pay Plaintiff $900.00 on or before May 20, 2011. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/20/2011. (knh)
December 13, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting in part 66 Application to Extend Pre-Trial Motion Cut-Off Date and (2) Issuing Third Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 12/13/2010. (knh)
August 2, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Clarifying Denial of Defendants' Rule 12(b)(1)-(2) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Denying 51 Motion to Clarify. The September 7, 2010 hearing date is vacated. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/2/2010. (knh)
July 13, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice defendants' Rule 12(b)(1)-(2) and 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss 32 in its entirety. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/12/10. (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weakley v. Redline Recovery Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Weakley
Represented By: Joshua Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redline Recovery Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Riley Chates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?