Mednansky et al v. Metz et al

Plaintiff: David Mednansky and Martine Mednansky
Defendant: William Metz, Owen C Martin, Randy Moore, Ritu Ahuja, Marlene Finley and Donna Grosz
Case Number: 3:2009cv01478
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Complaint and Re: Amendment of Complaint; Because no claims have been adequately pleaded, the complaint is dismissed in its entirety; the First Amendment, due process, and Ninth Amendment claims are dismissed without leave to amend; The equal protection claim, including the claim as it may apply to Defendants Moore, Ahuja, Finley, and Grosz, is dismissed without prejudice; If the Plaintiffs believe they can amend their complaint to correct the deficiencies identified in this ord er they must first seek leave to amend; They should do so by filing an ex parte application seeking leave to amend, and attaching the proposed amended complaint as an exhibit; The ex parte application must be filed no later than 21 calendar days from the date this order is issued; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/26/10. (kaj)
December 9, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Rejecting Motion for Leave to Amend and ORDER Re December 14, 2009 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss: Currently on calendar for Monday, December 14, 2009 at 11:15 a.m. is a hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss, which is now fully briefed. T he Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is taken off calendar and this motion is taken under submission. No appearances will be required on December 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/8/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jrl).
November 23, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Summarily Denying 33 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions; and ORDER Re Filings: Plaintiffs have filed three motions with a purported hearing date of December 7, 2009, without having obtained this date from the Court. Plaintiffs have been referred to Civil Local Rule 7.1(b). Any future attempted filings that violate this rule will be rejected or stricken. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/18/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jrl).
November 18, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 22 Ex Parte Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/18/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jrl).
November 10, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/9/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mednansky et al v. Metz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mednansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martine Mednansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Metz
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen C Martin
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moore
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ritu Ahuja
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Finley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Grosz
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?