Pacheco v. Preferred Meal Systems, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Gabriela Pacheco
Defendant: Preferred Meal Systems, Inc, Eric Shellenback, Heather McDermott and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01481
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 joint Motion to Dismiss matter with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file.Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/30/2010. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tkl)
November 30, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Per Order 44 , Clerk's Judgment be set aside. CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Defendants' motion for sanctions is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)(av1). Modified text on 12/9/2009 (tkl).
November 6, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 leave to Defendants to file a supplemental answer, which only answers the new claims Plaintiff raises in her first amended complaint, and any corresponding new affirmative defenses, as stipulated to by the parties. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/6/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
October 29, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to file Supplemental pleading. Instead, the court grants Plaintiff leave to file a first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/29/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacheco v. Preferred Meal Systems, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Pacheco
Represented By: Joshua D Gruenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Meal Systems, Inc
Represented By: Samantha Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Shellenback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather McDermott
Represented By: Samantha Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?