Moses Clark v. Larry Small

Plaintiff: Moses Clark
Defendant: Larry Small
Case Number: 3:2009cv01484
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/23/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
November 5, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Doc. 54 ) Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Disqualify. Plaintiff's renewed motion to disqualify is Denied. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/5/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)(mam).
October 18, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Providing Notice To Pro Se Prisoner of Requirements For Opposing Summary Judgment Pursuant To Klingele / Rand And Setting Briefing Schedule. It is Ordered that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment has been calendared for hearing on December 20, 2010, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 14. Plaintiff's Opposition must be filed by December 6, 2010. Defendants Reply to that Opposition is due by December 13, 2010. At the time appointed for hearing, the Court will, in its discretio n, consider Defendants' motion submitted on the papers and will issue its written opinion soon thereafter. Thus, unless otherwise ordered, no appearances are required and no oral argument will be heard. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/18/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm) Modified on 10/18/2010 to update docket text (srm).
March 15, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6); and Denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Reply to Opposition. De fendants Small and Madden shall file and serve their Answer to the First Amendment and RLUIPA claims that remain in Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date this Order is Filed pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(a)(4)(A). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/15/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses Clark v. Larry Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Small
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?