Denham v. Aranda et al
Plaintiff: |
Paul Denham |
Defendant: |
Aranda, Benvin, Marrero, E. A. Contreas, Silvia Garcia, P. Cortez, Hernandez, Director of Corrections and K. Smith |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv01505 |
Filed: |
July 10, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Monterey |
Presiding Judge: |
Barbara Lynn Major |
Presiding Judge: |
Janis L. Sammartino |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 17, 2012 |
Filing
134
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 117 119 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Denham SHALL FILE his second amended complaint within fourteen days of the date this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/17/2012. (mtb) (jrl).
|
June 9, 2011 |
Filing
68
ORDER denying 67 Motion for Rehearing on Motion Requesting CDCR to Provide Full Legal Names of Defendants; and the USDC Clerk to Serve Defendants by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/9/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
|
May 16, 2011 |
Filing
63
ORDER denying 61 Motion for Order for CDCR to Provide Full Legal Names of Aranda and Benvin and Order the USDC Clerk to Serve Defendants Aranda and Benvin by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/16/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)(jrd)
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing
51
ORDER: (1) granting in part and denying in part 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Request ruling on Motion to Command U.S. Marshal to Reattempt Service on 3 Unserved Defendants; (2) granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants; (3) denying 48 50 Plaintiff's Motions Requesting Court Order Substituted Service: The Court orders Defendants' attorney to provide the forwarding addresses for Defendants Aranda, Benvin and Silvia Garcia to the U.S. Marshal in a confidential memorandum on or before 4/25/11. Within 30 days of receipt of any available address from Defendants' attorney, the Court orders the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and summons upon Def endants Aranda, Benvin and Silvia Garcia. The Clerk of the Court to provide a copy of: (1) the Court's 8/31/09 Order; (2) this Order; (3) the First Amended Complaint, summons and a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 to Defendants' attorney for purposes of re-attempting service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cc: USM; documents mailed to Defendants' attorney)(lmt)
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing
43
ORDER ADOPTING 42 Report and Recommendations re 39 Motion to Dismiss: the Court (1) adopts Magistrate Judge Gallo's report and recommendation; (2) grants with prejudice Defendants' motion to dismiss with regard to Plaintiff's Eight h Amendment claim and qualified immunity for Hernandez, Smith, and Cate; (3) and denies Defendants' motion to dismiss with regard to Plaintiff's retaliation claim against Marrero, Cortez, and Contreras, and qualified immunity for the three aforementioned parties. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/4/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
|
June 21, 2010 |
Filing
36
ORDER: (1) Adopting Magistrate Judge Gallo's 35 Report and Recommendation; (2) Granting Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint curing the deficiencies stated in Magistrate Judge Gallo's R&R within 45 days of the date this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/21/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?