Woodfork v. Secretary et al

Petitioner: Jeffrey Anthony Woodfork
Respondent: Secretary and Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01543
Filed: July 15, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Bernardino
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The court hereby adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus and motions for an evidentiary hearing and appointment of counsel are denied. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/27/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc)
January 7, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 22 Petitioner's Motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/7/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)(jrl).
August 28, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 without prejudice Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/28/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodfork v. Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Anthony Woodfork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?