Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Sonicview USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C., Echostar Technologies L.L.C. and Nagrastar L.L.C.
Defendant: Sonicview USA, Inc., Sonicviewra LLC, Sonicviewsa LLC, Roberto Sanz, DontPay4TV, LLC, Duane Bernard, Courtney Bernard and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01553
Filed: July 17, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1934
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motions in Opposition to Judgment Debtor Danial Pierce's Claims of Exemption 330 , 331 .. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/20/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
October 29, 2012 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 273 October 11, 2012 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Opposition of Claim of Exemption. Defendant fails to show that any of the funds in his Armed Forces Bank account should be exempt from collection. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/26/2012.(sjt) (jrl).
October 11, 2012 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 262 Defendants' Objections to 256 Magistrate Judge's August 30, 2012 Order. The Court also DENIES Defendants renewed motion for a protective order that they incorporated into their objection. That renewed motion should be made before Judge Gallo. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/11/2012.(sjt)
September 20, 2012 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Courtney Bernard's Motion For Clarification And/Or Reconsideration (Re Doc. 187 ). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/19/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notice also was mailed to Atty Christopher P. Craven.) (mdc)
August 27, 2012 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 249 Motion to Quash without prejudice. The subpoenas at issue in the Motion were issued by the Central District of California. The Court does not have authority to act on the subpoenas issued by another district. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/27/2012. (sjt)
June 21, 2012 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 183 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment. Defendants are to provide a $650,000 bond to secure Plaintiffs interest in the judgment before they file any post-judgment motions. Defendants shall file any post-judgment motions under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59 or 60 by July 2, 2012. Plaintiffs shall file their oppositions by July 16, 2012. Defendants shall file their replies by July 23, 2012. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/19/2012. (mtb)
May 31, 2012 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 136 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying 141 Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs in the amount of $64,980,200 against the Sonicview Defendants, an d $984,800 jointly against Duane Bernard and Courtney Bernard. Defendants are also permanently enjoined as described above, and ordered to destroy all Sonicview receivers, iHubs, and A-1 modules in their possession. Finally, Plaintiffs may pursue attorneys fees and costs as described above. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/31/2012. (mtb)
April 10, 2012 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Compelling Production of Defendants' Business Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/10/2012.(mtb)
October 13, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Defendants' Expert Witness Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/13/2011.(mtb)
October 11, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Defendants' 123 Objections to Magistrate Judge's August 23, 2011 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/3/2011.(mtb)
April 6, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Defendants' Objections To Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/6/2011. (srm)
November 4, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Defendants' Motion to De-Designate Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Submissions from "Attorneys-Eyes-Only" to "Confidential". Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/4/2009. (mjj) (jrl).
August 20, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Seal: No later than August 25, 2009 Plaintiffs shall file a Supplemental Declaration of Clayton D. Craighead in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, attaching Nigel Jones expert report redacted in accordance with this order. The Clerk is directed to file under seal the documents listed in this order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/20/2009. (mjj) (jrl).
July 23, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Denying 6 Ex Parte Motion for TRO; Denying 6 Ex Parte Motion for Writ of Civil Seizure/Impoundment; Denying 6 Ex Parte Motion for Order to Show Cause; Granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/23/2009. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Sonicview USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Echostar Technologies L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagrastar L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonicview USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonicviewra LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonicviewsa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Sanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DontPay4TV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?