Quintero Family Trust et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Quintero Family Trust, George Hannibal Quintero and Celia G. Quintero
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, IndyMac Bancorp, Inc., Quality Loan Service Corp., Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bill Laney and Breakthrough Marketing, Inc.
Trustee: George Hannibal Quintero and Celia G. Quintero
Receiver: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv01561
Filed: July 17, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Dismiss; with regard to the Preliminary Injunction that was entered against all Defendants, except Defendant Clarion, on November 25, 2009, the Court CONTINUES the injunction and will NOT REQUIRE additional undertaking by Plaintiffs at this stage. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/25/10. (kaj)
January 27, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part One West Bank FSB's 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc.'s 11 Motion to Dismiss. Court denies Dfts' motion as to the TILA claim for reci ssion alleged in the first cause of action. Plaintiffs have leave to amend claim if they wish in conjunction w/ the other dismissed claims. The Motions to Dismiss are granted, in all other respects. Court dismisses w/ leave to amend: 1.) 2nd and 5th causes of action against OneWest and IndyMac, 2.) 6th cause of action for violation of Sections 2605(a) and 2605(e) of RESPA against all moving dfts, 3.) 8th, 9th, 10th, 14th and 15th causes of actions against all moving dfts. Plaintiffs shall 30 day s from the file date of this Order to file a Second Amended Complaint. Court dismisses w/o prejudice: 1.) 2nd cause of action against Clarion, and 2.) 4th, 12th, and 13th causes of actions against all moving dfts. Court dismisses w/ prejudice: 1.) TI LA claim for damages alleged in the 1st cause of action, 2.) 5th cause of action against Clarion, 3.) allegations in the 6th cause of action for improper payments for referrals and charges for services never rendered, and 4.) 7th and 11th causes of a ction against all moving dfts. With regard to the Preliminary Injunction entered on 11/25/2009 against all Dfts except Clarion, Court continues the injunction and will not require additional undertaking by Plaintiffs at this stage. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/27/2010. (jah) (jrl).
December 11, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 45 Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and denying 45 Motion for Order for a Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Hearing on the three (3) Motions to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions shall remain scheduled for 1/12/2010 at 10:30am. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/11/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (jrl).
October 1, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Coordinate Motions to Dismiss, Set a Briefing Schedule, and Consolidate Hearings. The Court sets Monday, December 7, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. as the new hearing date for Motions to Dismiss 8 an d 11 . The Court vacates the current hearing dates. Plaintiffs' opposition to both Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 11/16/09. Defendants' replies to Plaintiffs' opposition by 11/30/09. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/1/09. (tkl) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintero Family Trust et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintero Family Trust
Represented By: Christian B. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hannibal Quintero
Represented By: Christian B. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia G. Quintero
Represented By: Christian B. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: George Hannibal Quintero
Represented By: Christian B. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Celia G. Quintero
Represented By: Christian B. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bancorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breakthrough Marketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?