Coleman et al v. Sterling et al

Plaintiff: Allen Coleman, Suellyn Ellerbe, Dan Groszkruger, Terry Howell, Ondrea Labella, Doreen Sanderson and Robert Wardwell
Defendant: Kathleen Sterling, Rosemarie Reno, Charlene Anderson, George Coulter, Larry Anderson, Tri-City Healthcare District and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv01594
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling Defendants' 94 Objection to Magistrate Judge's March 24, 2011 Discovery Order and denying 96 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 5/23/11. (rlu)
May 3, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Counterdefendants' 67 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Motion for More Definite Statement; sustaining Counterclaimant's 73 Objection. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 5/3/11. (rlu)
March 24, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Joint Discover Motion No. 1 in Re Plaintiffs' Request for Unredacted Copies of Investigative Reports. Defendant shall produce unredacted copies of the investigative reports to Plaintiffs no later than April 1, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/24/11. (rlu)
March 7, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/7/2011. (amh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Sterling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Coleman
Represented By: Ray J Artiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suellyn Ellerbe
Represented By: Ray J Artiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Groszkruger
Represented By: Ray J Artiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Howell
Represented By: Ray J Artiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ondrea Labella
Represented By: Ray J Artiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Sanderson
Represented By: Ray J Artiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wardwell
Represented By: Ray J Artiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sterling
Represented By: Thomas Lee Tosdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemarie Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-City Healthcare District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?