Groce v. Claudat

Plaintiff: Mark Glen Groce
Defendant: Thedore Bernard Claudat
Case Number: 3:2009cv01630
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Riverside
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court Grants Defendant's motion and awards summary judgment in favor of Defendant on all causes of action. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/30/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
September 16, 2012 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 67 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/16/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
May 18, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 72 Defendant's Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 5/18/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
May 19, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 29 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Defendant's arguments based on the statute of limitations were improperly raised. Pursuant to the August 24, 2010 Order, Defendant may raise statute of limitations defenses in a motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff has alleged sufficient facts to show that Defendant had failed "to secure the payment of compensation" as required by the Act, and thus, Plaintiff's negligence claims are not preempted. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/18/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)(jrd)
August 24, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 16 Motion to Dismiss. All Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED except for the UCL claim as it relates to events occurring after July 23, 2005. Plaintiff has leave to amend his Complaint to fix the problem s described above. The deadline for filing an Amended Complaint is September 26, 2010. Failure to file a timely amended complaint will result in an order dismissing the claims dismissed herein without further leave to amend. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/24/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groce v. Claudat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Glen Groce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thedore Bernard Claudat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?