Scalf v. Salazar

Petitioner: Fred Robert Scalf, III
Respondent: John F Salazar
Case Number: 3:2009cv01676
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Riverside
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and denying a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/30/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
March 2, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Respondent's 6 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 9 Report and Recommendation; Respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, as well as points and authorities in support of such answer, no later then April 2, 2010. Along with the answer, Respondent shall lodge with the Court all records bearing on the merits of Petitioners claims; Petitioner may file a traverse to matters raised in the answer no later then May 3, 2010; Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/2/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
February 10, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John F Salazar be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2010 and Replies due by 3/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 02/10/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jrl). Modified on 3/3/2010 to correct text (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalf v. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fred Robert Scalf, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John F Salazar
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?